IL HB5971 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The amount of $76,220,000, or so much of that amount as may be necessary, is appropriated from the Energy Efficiency Trust Fund to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity for the implementation of energy-efficiency related rebate agreements, grants, contracts, or other programs created under certain provisions of the Public Utilities Act. Effective immediately.
Title
$DCEO- ENERGY EFFICIENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-01 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2016-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2016-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pamela Reaves-Harris |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |