IL HB5969 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1274
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1274
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that there shall be no fee paid for a certificate of title issued to a county when the vehicle is a junk vehicle and the vehicle is forfeited to the county under the Vehicle Forfeiture Article of the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that a county, sheriff, deputy sheriff, or employee of the county sheriff shall not be civilly or criminally liable for any damage to a forfeited vehicle stored with a commercial vehicle safety relocator. Eliminates provision that certain personal property belonging to the vehicle owner of a vehicle that is determined to be a hazardous dilapidated motor vehicle is subject to a lien. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD&CRIM CD-FORFEITED VEH
Sponsors
Sen. Chapin Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-26 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1274 | |
2010-07-26 | Effective Date July 26, 2010 | |
2010-07-26 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Transportation; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading | |
2010-03-25 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-08 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-03-04 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-04 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-000-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |