IL HB5929 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Teacher and Chicago Teacher Articles of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that none of the benefits provided for in either Article shall be paid to a person if the person first becomes a member after the effective date of the amendatory Act and a board, after an administrative hearing, determines that the person sexually abused a student. Provides that an employer must notify a board if a retiring member has been accused of sexually abusing a student. Provides that a board may, through an administrative hearing, review the claim of sexual abuse and may order that benefits be forfeited. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act shall not operate to impair any contract or vested right acquired before the effective date of the amendatory Act nor to preclude the right to a refund. Provides that all teachers entering service after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall be deemed to have consented to the provisions of the amendatory Act as a condition of membership. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-TEACHERS-FORFEITURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-11-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-11-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-09-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-09-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-08-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-08-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-08-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-08-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-08-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2018-07-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-07-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-07-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 16-169.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-169.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 16-199 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-143.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-143.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 17-149.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5929&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5929.htm |