IL HB5914 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 13 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act to provide that in the case of sexual assault or sexual abuse by school district personnel, nothing in the Act prohibits a school district from disclosing disciplinary records of school district personnel. Amends the School Code to require a school board to report all credible cases of sexual assault or sexual abuse by a licensed educator to the State Board of Education, to establish a hearing procedure for student victims, and to ensure that a licensed educator under investigation by the State Superintendent of Education is reassigned to non-classroom duty. Provides that, beginning with the 2018-2019 school year, the State Board of Education must monitor all fingerprint-based criminal history records checks and any other database checks conducted by a school district or regional superintendent for applicants for employment with a school district. Makes changes concerning educator licensure and allegations of physical or sexual abuse. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 to create the criminal offense of sexual conduct or sexual relations with a student by an authority figure. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 to require an arresting enforcement agency to share its reports pertaining to the arrest of a licensed educator with the superintendent of any school district that employs the educator (or, in the case of the arrest of a superintendent, with the school board of any school district that employs the superintendent). Amends the Personnel Record Review Act to provide that the Act does not prohibit a school district from divulging internal investigative findings and discipline to another school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-SEXUAL ASSAULT/ABUSE

Sponsors

Rep. David McSweeney [R]Rep. Mary Flowers [D]Rep. Grant Wehrli [R]Rep. Rita Mayfield [D]
Rep. Brian Stewart [R]Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D]Rep. John Connor [D]Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D]
Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R]Rep. Ryan Spain [R]Rep. Margo McDermed [R]Rep. Gregory Harris [D]
Rep. Emanuel Welch [D]Rep. Nicholas Smith [D]Rep. Jaime Andrade [D]Rep. Mark Batinick [R]
Rep. Jerry Costello [D]Rep. Tom Demmer [R]Rep. Katie Stuart [D]Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin [D]
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D]Rep. Sonya Harper [D]Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D]Rep. Sue Scherer [D]
Rep. Thomas Morrison [R]Rep. Natalie Manley [D]Rep. LaShawn Ford [D]Rep. John Cabello [R]
Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R]Rep. Martin Moylan [D]Rep. Randy Frese [R]Rep. Jeanne Ives [R]
Rep. Thaddeus Jones [D]Rep. Daniel Swanson [R]Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D]Rep. Justin Slaughter [D]
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D]Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D]Rep. Linda LaVia [D]Rep. Deborah Conroy [D]
Rep. Tony McCombie [R]Rep. Steven Andersson [R]Rep. Patricia Bellock [R]Rep. Barbara Wheeler [R]
Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R]Rep. Sam Yingling [D]Rep. Michelle Mussman [D]Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D]
Rep. John D'Amico [D]Rep. Cynthia Soto [D]Rep. David Welter [R]Rep. Norine Hammond [R]
Rep. Christian Mitchell [D]Rep. Kathleen Willis [D]Rep. David Olsen [R]Rep. Sara Jimenez [R]
Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R]Rep. Sara Feigenholtz [D]Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R]Rep. Jerry Long [R]
Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R]Rep. Brad Halbrook [R]Rep. Dave Severin [R]Rep. Keith Wheeler [R]
Rep. Robert Pritchard [R]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-06-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2018-06-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-06-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-06-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-06-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-06-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-06-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-06-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-06-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-06-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-06-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-06-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-06-13HouseCo-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-06-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-06-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-06-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105510-21.9Amended CodeCitation Text
105510-30New CodeSee Bill Text
105521B-15Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-75Amended CodeCitation Text
105521B-80Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.5Amended CodeCitation Text
105534-18.60New CodeSee Bill Text
105534-84bAmended CodeCitation Text
51407.7New CodeSee Bill Text
720511-9.6New CodeSee Bill Text
7255107-17New CodeSee Bill Text
820407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback