IL HB5859 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0926
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. In connection with the medical assistance program, provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall adopt rules for payment of claims for reimbursement for covered dental services that allow a qualified provider of such services who is volunteering his or her time at no cost to a not-for-profit health clinic to designate such health clinic as alternate payee. Provides that a not-for-profit health clinic may be a public or private health clinic or Federally Qualified Health Center where covered dental services are performed. Provides that if a qualified provider of covered dental services designates a not-for-profit health clinic as alternate payee, the provider shall not be required to individually enroll as a participating vendor in the medical assistance program and the Department shall establish a process for making reimbursement payments to such alternate payee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-MEDICAID-DENTAL SERVICES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-14 Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0926
2010-06-14 Effective Date January 1, 2011
2010-06-14 Governor Approved
2010-05-27 Sent to the Governor
2010-04-28 Passed Both Houses
2010-04-28 Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2010-04-28 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2010-04-28 Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado
2010-04-21 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010
2010-04-21 Second Reading
2010-04-21 Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2010-04-20 Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010
2010-04-20 Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2010-04-14 Postponed - Human Services
2010-04-06 Assigned to Human Services
2010-04-06 Referred to Assignments
2010-04-06 First Reading
2010-04-06 Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio
2010-04-06 Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
2010-04-06 Arrive in Senate
2010-03-25 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2010-03-25 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente
2010-03-25 Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2010-03-25 Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-002
2010-03-24 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-24 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
2010-03-24 Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-24 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2010-03-22 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-03-22 House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson
2010-03-02 Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2010-03-02 Second Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-24 Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2010-02-24 Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 007-000-000
2010-02-16 Assigned to Human Services Committee
2010-02-10 Referred to Rules Committee
2010-02-10 First Reading
2010-02-10 Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2010-02-10 Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback