IL HB5849 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Gun Violence Protection Order Act. Provides that a circuit court may issue a warrant to search for and seize a firearm in the possession of a person who is believed to pose a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others if: (1) a law enforcement officer provides the court a sworn affidavit; (2) the affidavit specifically describes the location of the firearm; and (3) the circuit court determines that probable cause exists to believe that the person poses a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or others and is in possession of a firearm. Provides that if a law enforcement officer seizes a firearm from a person whom the law enforcement officer believes to pose a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others without obtaining a warrant, the law enforcement officer shall submit to the circuit court having jurisdiction over the person believed to pose a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others, a written statement under oath or affirmation describing the basis for the law enforcement officer's belief that the person poses a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others. Provides that not later than 14 days after a return is filed or a written statement is submitted, the court shall conduct a hearing to determine whether the seized firearm should be: (1) returned to the person from whom the firearm was seized; or (2) retained by the law enforcement agency having custody of the firearm. Repeals the Firearm Seizure Act on January 1, 2019. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
FIREARM REVOCATION PROCEDURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-03-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5849&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5849.htm |