IL HB5849 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that the exemption from violations of the unlawful use of a weapon statutes for carrying firearms applies to portable containers designed for the safe transportation of firearms (rather than any container). Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-FIREARM TRANSPORT
Sponsors
Rep. William Burns [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Charles Jefferson [D] | Rep. Harry Osterman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-05-07 | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed | |
2010-05-05 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2010-05-05 | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed | |
2010-05-05 | Home Rule Note Filed | |
2010-05-04 | Pension Note Filed | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-04 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-05-04 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-05-04 | Judicial Note Filed | |
2010-05-04 | State Debt Impact Note Filed | |
2010-05-03 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 006-004-000 | |
2010-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2010-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns | |
2010-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-04-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | |
2010-04-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-28 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2010-04-28 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry Osterman |