IL HB5832 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-01 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires the State Board of Education to establish and maintain a homeless student pilot program during the 2021-2022, 2022-2023, and 2023-2024 school years at Ryan Banks Academy ("the School") for at-risk homeless students or housing-unstable students who are exposed to trauma or violence. Provides requirements for the School and the program. Contains provisions regarding the pilot program's goals. Requires the State Board of Education to report its recommendation for expansion, revision, or discontinuation of the pilot program to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before June 1, 2023. Repeals the provisions on June 1, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-HOMELESS STUDENT PROG
Sponsors
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Lakesia Collins [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-11-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-11-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-11-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2020-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-10-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-10-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2020-09-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2020-09-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5832&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5832.htm |