IL HB5819 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Demonstrations Law. Replaces all references to the principal law enforcement officer for the area with references to the sheriff of the county where the march, assembly, meeting, parade, or gathering on roadways originates. Provides that a person who blocks an exceptionally busy public right-of-way for any period of not less than 5 minutes in a manner that prevents, or would prevent, the free passage of a peace officer, a firefighter, or an emergency medical services personnel responder, irrespective of the time of day or notice provided, commits a Class 4 felony. Provides that no act of notification to law enforcement is a defense to the Class 4 felony. Provides that no act or circumstance of scheduling or time is a defense to the Class 4 felony. Provides that if permission is requested from the sheriff of the county where the march, assembly, meeting, parade, or gathering on roadways originates under, it is the responsibility of the sheriff, not the requester, to coordinate with other law enforcement agencies in other jurisdictions as necessary. Preempts the concurrent exercise of home rule. Defines "exceptionally busy public right of way". Makes findings. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC DEMONSTRATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Sheehan |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Kelly |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis Tipsword, Jr. |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam M. Niemerg |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Wayne A Rosenthal |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Ugaste |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 70 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 70 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 70 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 70 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 70 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 70 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 70 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5819&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5819.htm |