IL HB5819 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-11-16 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that Constitution Day (September 17) shall also be a commemorative holiday. Effective July 1, 2023.
Title
SCH CD-CONSTITUTION DAY
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-11-16 | House | First Reading |
2022-10-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-10-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5819&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5819.htm |