IL HB5816 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Public Safety Officer Privacy Act. Prohibits a person, business, association, or government agency from publicly posting or displaying the personal information of a public safety officer 5 days after the receipt of an officer's written request to not post or display the personal information. Allows for injunctive or declaratory relief for violations. Prohibits a person, business, or association from soliciting, selling, or trading on the Internet a public safety officer's personal information with the intent to pose an imminent and serious threat to the health and safety of the public safety officer or the officer's immediate family. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Excludes personal information of a public safety officer covered by the Public Safety Officer Privacy Act from being included as a public record under the Freedom of Information Act, and from inspection or copying under the Act.
Title
PUBLIC SAFETY OFFICER PRIVACY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5816&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5816.htm |