IL HB5811 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Creates the Task Force on Foreign Language Education Requirements to review public policy options relating to foreign language education requirements for secondary education in this State. Sets forth the membership of the task force. Provides for expense reimbursement, meetings, and administrative support. Provides that the task force shall review policy offerings for the education of students in a foreign language and alternatives that may benefit students as students age into the workforce and offer policymaking recommendations related to alternatives to current foreign language education requirements. Sets forth other duties of the task force. Provides that the task force shall report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor by July 1, 2025. Provides that the task force is dissolved and the provisions are repealed on August 1, 2025.
Title
SCH CD-FOREIGN LANG TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | First Reading |
2024-04-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5811&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5811.htm |