IL HB5810 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-03 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Green Energy Business Act. Authorizes the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to receive and approve the applications of qualified businesses seeking designation as Green Energy Businesses. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act, and the Public Utilities Act to provide that Green Energy Businesses are eligible for certain credits and exemptions under those Acts. Effective immediately.
Title
GREEN ENERGY BUSINESS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-05-25 | Motion to Sustain the Chair - Prevailed 068-048-000 | |
2010-05-25 | Shall the Chair be Sustained | |
2010-05-25 | Appeal Ruling of Chair Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Discharge Committee Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Chair Rules Motion Lost | |
2010-05-25 | Objects to Motion Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-05-25 | Motion Filed to Discharge Rules Committee Rep. William B. Black | |
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Biggins | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-10 | Co-Sponsor Rep. Raymond Poe | |
2010-02-10 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2010-02-10 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2010-02-10 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2010-02-10 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost | |
2010-02-10 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5810&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5810.htm |