IL HB5806 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 1 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Provides that when investing or depositing public funds, each public agency shall invest or deposit such funds with or in financial institutions that have a board of directors consisting of at least 20% persons of color. Provides that a financial institution that does not have a board of directors consisting of at least 20% persons of color may increase or modify its board membership. Provides that any public agency investing or depositing public funds shall divest any previously invested or deposited funds from any financial institution failing to meet specified requirements by January 1, 2021. Defines "persons of color". Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC FUNDS-GOVT INVESTMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-11-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-07-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 235 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 235 | 7.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5806&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5806.htm |