IL HB5805 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0820
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0820
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a prosecution for theft of property (rather than involving real property) exceeding $100,000 in value or financial exploitation of an elderly person or a person with a disability may be commenced within 7 years of the last act committed in furtherance of the crime. Effective immediately.
Title
LIMITATION-THEFT-EXPLOIT ELDER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0820 |
2016-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2016 |
2016-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary Forby |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2016-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2016-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Bradley |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |