IL HB5785 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-17 - Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Urban Weatherization Initiative Act. Provides that the efforts of the Urban Weatherization Initiative shall be coordinated with federal weatherization programs. Requires the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to administer the Initiative so as to qualify for federal grant or matching programs. Provides the salary of employees hired under the Initiative in accordance with the hourly wages associated with the federal prevailing wage rates for weatherization workers. Provides that the maximum per unit expenditure is limited to $10,000 (currently $6,500) and that a grant recipient may not be awarded grants totaling more than $2,000,000 (currently $500,000) per fiscal year. Provides that 2 voting members of the Weatherization Initiative Board must have experience in residential weatherization or energy efficiency and that one voting member must have experience in workforce development. Requires the Board's annual report to be filed by May 31 (instead of December 31).
Title
WEATHERIZATION-FED COMPLIANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-17 | House | Bill Dead - No Positive Action Taken - Amendatory Veto |
2016-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2016-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-002-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-045-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-04-19 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2016-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2016-04-15 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-14 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-04-13 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2016-04-12 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2016-04-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-04-06 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-005-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2016-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 738 | 40-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 738 | 40-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 738 | 40-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 20 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |