IL HB5776 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Health Care Services Lien Act. Provides that "health care benefit plan" means an insurance plan provided by any public or private medical insurance provider. Adds procedures requiring a health care professional or health care provider to submit all charges to the patient's health care benefit plan prior to filing the notice of the lien. Provides that the patient's health care benefit plan shall not deny payment on the basis that a third party or other insurance carrier is responsible for the patient's injuries. Provides that the amount of the lien shall be limited to the amount the health care professional or the health care provider would have received if the charges were covered by the patient's health care benefit plan. Adds provisions concerning health care benefit plan subrogation claims. Provides that a health care professional or a health care provider that recovers under a judgment, verdict, or settlement is responsible for the pro rata share of the legal and administrative expenses incurred in obtaining the judgment, verdict, or settlement. Makes other changes.
Title
HEALTH LIEN-INSURANCE BILLING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
770 | 23 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 23 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
770 | 23 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5776&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5776.htm |