IL HB5775 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable years 2018 and thereafter: (1) the maximum reduction under the senior citizens homestead exemption is $8,000 in Cook, DuPage, Lake, McHenry, and Will Counties and $5,000 in all other counties (currently, $8,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $5,000 in all other counties); and (2) the maximum reduction under the general homestead exemption is $10,000 in Cook, DuPage, Lake, McHenry, and Will Counties and $6,000 in all other counties (currently, $10,000 in counties with 3,000,000 or more inhabitants and $6,000 in all other counties). Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-GENERAL AND SR. HOME
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-170 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5775&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5775.htm |