IL HB5774 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, for taxable year 2019 (payable in 2020), interest penalties shall be waived for the delinquent payment of any property tax installment. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-WAIVE INTEREST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-05-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-05-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 21-27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5774&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5774.htm |