IL HB5773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois (State Budget Law). Removes the salaries of members of the General Assembly from a Section allowing for a continuing appropriation of salaries for certain specified positions. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GA SALARY FUNDING REPEAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor
2018-05-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050-22Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback