IL HB5773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois (State Budget Law). Removes the salaries of members of the General Assembly from a Section allowing for a continuing appropriation of salaries for certain specified positions. Effective immediately.
Title
GA SALARY FUNDING REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-05-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 20 | 50-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5773&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5773.htm |