IL HB5771 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Welfare Act. Provides for the licensure of dog breeders and the regulation of commercial dog breeders. Defines "dog breeder" as any person who owns, has possession of, or harbors 6 or more female dogs capable of reproduction for the purpose of the sale of their offspring. Defines "commercial dog breeder" as any dog breeder who (1) owns, has possession of, or harbors 10 or more female dogs capable of reproduction; (2) breeds or whelps dogs; and (3) sells or transfers any dog to a whole sale dog dealer or pet shop or otherwise sells or transfers more than 30 dogs per calendar year. Provides additional requirements for licensees related to the treatment of dogs. Provides that, in addition to certain requirements imposed on other licensees under the Act, commercial dog breeders shall meet certain specified requirements concerning the treatment of dogs.
Title
DOG BREEDING-PUPPY MILLS
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Maria Berrios [D] | Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Rep. John Fritchey [D] |
Rep. Susana Mendoza [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Eddie Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-03-25 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-03-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John A. Fritchey | |
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Susana A. Mendoza |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5771&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5771.htm |