IL HB5749 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that directors and members of the Regional Transportation Authority, the Chicago Transit Board, the Suburban Bus Board, and the Commuter Rail Board appointed on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act of the 98th General Assembly owe a fiduciary duty to their respective service boards and to the Regional Transportation Authority.
Title
TRANSIT BDS-FIDUCIARY DUTY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 3A.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 3B.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5749&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5749.htm |