IL HB5732 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1458
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act. Provides that the annual 10% growth in appropriation may be exceeded when any participant extends its service area by either annexation or intergovernmental agreement.
Title
DOWNSTATE TRANSIT-EXPENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-20 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1458 | |
2010-08-20 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-08-20 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000 | |
2010-05-24 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-04-30 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-30 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 046-008-000 | |
2010-04-28 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Gary G. Dahl | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-20 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-14 | First Reading | |
2010-04-13 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 | |
2010-03-26 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-03-09 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |