IL HB5699 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Child Care Act of 1969. Includes religious institutions in the definition of "child welfare agency". Amends the Adoption Act. Provides that a church, synagogue, temple, mosque, or other religious institution that is an agency providing adoption services as defined in the Child Care Act of 1969 and that is licensed as a child welfare agency as defined in the Child Care Act of 1969 may adopt faith-based policies and practices relating to the placement of children for adoption that provide for the placement of a child with a prospective adoptive parent who holds the same religious beliefs as those held by that religious institution while maintaining the welfare of the child as the primary consideration in the placement.
Title
ADOPTION-FAITH BASED
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Adoption Reform Committee; 002-000-003 | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption Reform Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Shane Cultra | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption Reform Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Adoption Reform Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-09 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Shane Cultra |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5699&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB5699.htm |