IL HB5698 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the imposition of term limits by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise must be prospective. Provides that elective office held prior to the effective date of any term limit imposed by a municipality shall not prohibit a person otherwise eligible from running for or holding elective office in that municipality. Provides that term limits imposed in a manner inconsistent with the applicable provisions are invalid. Provides that these provisions apply to all term limits imposed by a municipality by referendum, ordinance, or otherwise passed on or after November 8, 2016. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI CD-MUNICIPAL TERM LIMITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-05-22HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-22HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-18HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Cities & Villages Committee; Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-07HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6553.1-10-17New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback