IL HB5695 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $3,000,000 from the Road Fund to the Rail Division of the Illinois Department of Transportation for the hiring of additional employees. Appropriates $5,000,000 from the Road Fund to the Illinois Department of Transportation High Speed Rail Commission for support and planning purposes. Appropriates $10,000,000 from the Road Fund to the Illinois Department of Transportation for engineering support. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$IDOT RAIL & ENGINEERING
Sponsors
Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] |
Rep. Dave Vella [D] | Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] | Sen. Mark Walker [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-02-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-22 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2022-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5695&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB5695.pdf |