IL HB5692 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0779
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Deletes language providing that the season limit for river otter shall not exceed 5 river otters per person per season. Effective immediately.
Title
WILDLIFE-RIVER OTTER LIMIT
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Sen. Neil Anderson [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 72 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0779 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 008-001-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 072-025-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 2.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |