IL HB5667 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the State Finance Act. Provides that the Department of State Police shall create and maintain an animal abuse registry. Requires a person 18 years of age or older who resides in or is domiciled in this State and has been convicted of specified offenses involving animal cruelty or torture to register with the Department to be placed on the registry. Requires a person required to register to pay an annual fee of $50 to the Department. Prohibits a person required to register from owning a companion animal or being employed at an animal shelter, pound, pet shop, zoo, or other business where companion animals are present. Creates the Animal Abuse Registry Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that registration fees shall be deposited into the Fund to be used by the Department for establishing and maintaining the animal abuse registry. Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMAL ABUSE REGISTRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 002-004-000; -FAILED |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-09 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-331 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.886 | New Code | See Bill Text |