IL HB5651 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Government Reform Task Force to investigate ways to streamline State government, reduce spending and waste, find and suggest changes to duplicative, onerous, or redundant statutes and rules, and make suggestions to eliminate any other inefficiencies in the manner in which State government conducts State business. Sets forth Task Force membership. Provides that members of the Task Force shall not receive compensation for services, but may be reimbursed for their reasonable expenses. Requires the Task Force to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2015. Contains a repealer provision.
Title
GOVERNMENT REFORM TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5651&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5651.htm |