IL HB5639 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. In a provision concerning substitute teacher recruiting firms, provides that an individual hired by a recruiting firm may teach no more than 5 consecutive days per licensed teacher who is under a collective bargaining agreement.
Title
SCH CD-SUB RECRUITING FIRMS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.173 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5639&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5639.htm |