IL HB5624 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Protection District. Provides that on January 1, 2020, the territory of the Bloomingdale Fire Protection District 1 within the Village of Hanover Park is disconnected from the Bloomingdale Fire Protection District 1 if the mayor of the Village of Hanover Park signs a certification authorizing the disconnection and the clerk of the Village of Hanover Park transmits, on or before December 31, 2019, a certified copy of the certification to the county clerk of DuPage County and to the Office of the State Fire Marshal. Provides that if the territory is disconnected, then, beginning January 1, 2020, the Village of Hanover Park must provide fire protection services to the disconnected territory, and the territory disconnected remains liable for its proportional share of any outstanding bonded indebtedness of the Bloomingdale Fire Protection District 1.
Title
BLOOMINGDALE FIRE PROTECTION
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | To Fire Service Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |