IL HB5598 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall issue distinctive registration plates for covered farm vehicles. Provides that a $10 surcharge shall be collected, in addition to all applicable fees, for the issuance of a registration plate. Provides that the surcharge shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that a designation as a covered farm vehicle shall not limit the purposes for which that vehicle may otherwise be used. Makes a corresponding change to the definition of "covered farm vehicle". Effective immediately.
Title
DISTINCT PLATE-COVERED FARM
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Rep. Ryan Spain [R] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 26, 2018 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 18b-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |