IL HB5596 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. With regard to the textbook block grant program, provides that the textbooks authorized to be purchased must accurately portray the diversity of our society, including the role and contributions of people protected under the Illinois Human Rights Act, and must be non-discriminatory as to certain characteristics under the Act. Provides that the teaching of history of the United States in public schools shall include a study of the role and contributions of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in the history of this country and this State. Requires every public elementary school and high school to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction studying the significant role of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender individuals in society. Specifies instruction requirements. Requires the regional superintendent of schools to monitor a school district's compliance with the curriculum requirements. Effective July 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-LGBT-UNIT OF INSTRCTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-12HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Thomas Morrison
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-004-001
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.155Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-21Amended CodeCitation Text
105527-23.11New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback