IL HB5596 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to the textbook block grant program, provides that the textbooks authorized to be purchased must accurately portray the diversity of our society, including the role and contributions of people protected under the Illinois Human Rights Act, and must be non-discriminatory as to certain characteristics under the Act. Provides that the teaching of history of the United States in public schools shall include a study of the role and contributions of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender people in the history of this country and this State. Requires every public elementary school and high school to include in its curriculum a unit of instruction studying the significant role of lesbian, gay, bisexual, and transgender individuals in society. Specifies instruction requirements. Requires the regional superintendent of schools to monitor a school district's compliance with the curriculum requirements. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
SCH CD-LGBT-UNIT OF INSTRCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 010-004-001 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 27-23.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |