IL HB5576 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0984
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Provides that the State shall not regulate a profession, occupation, industry, business or trade in a manner that will unreasonably and adversely affect either the competitive market or equitable access to quality jobs and economic opportunities (rather than the competitive market). Adds a requirement that the Office of Management and Budget's study on the performance of regulatory agencies shall include in its report an analysis of whether the agency or program restricts a profession, occupation, business, industry or trade any more than is necessary to protect the public health, safety or welfare from significant and discernible harm or damage. Provides that the Office of Management and Budget's study can examine the termination, modification, or continuation of a regulatory agency or program (rather than termination or continuation). Makes changes regarding the factors that the Office of Management and Budget includes in its study on the performance of regulatory agencies scheduled for termination. Defines "personal qualifications" and "scope of practice". Makes other changes.
Title
REGULATORY SUNSET ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0984 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-013-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 022-002-000 |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |