IL HB5564 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-16 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Eminent Domain Act. Provides that, with specified exceptions, if either party in the condemnation action demands a trial by jury, the condemning authority shall not be granted title or possession and the owner shall not be restrained from denying access to the property until the jury ascertains compensation.
Title
EMINENT DOMAIN - TRIAL BY JURY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-10 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-10 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-10 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 001-002-000 |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-07 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 30 | 10-5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 7-101 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5564&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5564.htm |