IL HB5564 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of State Police may make the information contained in the Statewide Organized Criminal Gang Database (SWORD) electronically available to the general public (rather than only prosecutors and law enforcement agencies).
Title
STATE POLICE-GANG DATABASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Deborah Mell |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5564&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5564.htm |