IL HB5549 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that the $100,000 contribution requirement for tax checkoffs does not apply to the Diabetes Research Checkoff Fund checkoff. Provides that the Diabetes Research Checkoff Fund checkoff shall be included on the individual tax return even if the limit of 15 tax checkoffs has been reached. Provides that the Diabetes Research Checkoff Fund checkoff shall not be included when calculating the 15 tax-checkoff fund limitation. Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that 50% of the grants made from the Diabetes Research Checkoff Fund shall be made to the Illinois Chapter of the Juvenile Diabetes Research Foundation (JDRF), and 50% of the grants made from the Diabetes Research Checkoff Fund shall be made to the American Diabetes Association. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-DIABETES CHECKOFF
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Cross [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. James Durkin [R] | Rep. Michael Tryon [R] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. James Clayborne [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013 |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-01-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2012 |
2012-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 006-000-004 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2012-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 23, 2012 |
2012-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2012-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-001 |
2012-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2012-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-01 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-03-01 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2310 | 2310-642 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 509 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 509.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |