IL HB5544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0913
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0913
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Council on Women and Girls Act. Creates the Illinois Council on Women and Girls. Provides that the Council shall advise the Governor and the General Assembly on policy issues impacting women and girls in this State with specified goals. Provides for the appointment of members to the Council. Provides for the meetings and operations of the Council. Requires the Council to issue semi-annual reports on its policy recommendations by June 30th and December 31st of each year to the Governor and the General Assembly. Provides findings and declaration of policy. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.
Title
IL COUNCIL ON WOMEN & GIRLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0913 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2018 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 032-001-000 |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-024-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-003-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-003-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Economic Justice & Equity Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Justice & Equity Committee |
2018-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-002-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-02-28 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller |