IL HB5544 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Council on Women and Girls Act. Creates the Illinois Council on Women and Girls. Provides that the Council shall advise the Governor and the General Assembly on policy issues impacting women and girls in this State with specified goals. Provides for the appointment of members to the Council. Provides for the meetings and operations of the Council. Requires the Council to issue semi-annual reports on its policy recommendations by June 30th and December 31st of each year to the Governor and the General Assembly. Provides findings and declaration of policy. Provides a severability clause. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

IL COUNCIL ON WOMEN & GIRLS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 26 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 032-001-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-024-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-003-000
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-003-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Economic Justice & Equity Committee; 006-002-000
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2018-02-28HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-28HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-02-28HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Economic Justice & Equity Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback