IL HB5522 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall establish a Long-Term Services and Supports Disparities Task Force. Provides that members of the Task Force shall be appointed by the Director of the Department and shall include representatives from several specified agencies, organizations, or groups including a representative of providers that serve the predominantly ethnic minority populations, 3 consumer representatives which may include a consumer of long-term services and supports or an individual who advocates for such consumers, and Case Management Organizations. Provides that the Task Force shall not meet unless all consumer representative positions are filled and shall reflect diversity in race, ethnicity, and gender. Provides that the Task Force shall promote and facilitate communication, coordination, and collaboration among relevant State agencies and communities of color, limited English-speaking communities, and the private and public entities providing services to those communities. Sets forth the numerous duties of the Task Force including (i) documenting the number and types of Long-Term Services and Supports (LTSS) providers in the State and the number of clients served in each setting; (ii) comparing data over multiple years to identify trends in the delivery of LTSS for each racial or ethnic category; and (iii) assessing whether the LTSS industry is equipped to offer culturally sensitive, competent, and linguistically appropriate care. Contains provisions concerning the appointment of the Chair of the Task Force; public hearings; and reporting requirements. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
DHFS-LONG-TERM SRVC TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-001-000 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-18 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-11 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-04-11 | House | Motion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-04-08 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2014-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |