IL HB5483 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1473
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1473
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Open Meetings Act. Requires a public body to make proposed minutes of an open meeting available for public inspection within 8 business days after the meeting to which the minutes relate and make approved minutes of an open meeting available for public inspection within 5 business days after approval (now, make available within 7 business days after approval).
Title
OPEN MEETINGS-MINUTES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-23 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1473 | |
2010-08-23 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-08-23 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 111-000-000 | |
2010-05-07 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Counties & Townships Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 | |
2010-05-04 | Arrived in House | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) | |
2010-05-04 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Garrett | |
2010-05-04 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 30, 2010 | |
2010-04-29 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Executive | |
2010-04-12 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-12 | First Reading | |
2010-04-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2010-04-06 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 13, 2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-23 | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2010-03-23 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-23 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-19 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-03-16 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2010-03-15 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-12 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-12 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 015-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel |