IL HB5468 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person is not engaged in conduct that would constitute a felony or a Class A misdemeanor or in a place where the person does not have a right to be if the person is engaged in the activity or in the place due to the person's status as a trafficking victim. Provides that a person must prove the person's status as a trafficking victim by clear and convincing evidence. Provides that the person may provide clear and convincing evidence of the person's status as a trafficking victim through testimony at trial. Defines "trafficking victim" as a person subjected to the practices prohibited by the involuntary servitude, involuntary sexual servitude of a minor, or trafficking in persons statutes.
Title
TRAFFICKING VICTIMS-DEFENSE
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro [R] | Rep. Nicole La Ha [R] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] | Rep. Jeff Keicher [R] |
Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Brandun Schweizer [R] | Rep. Mike Coffey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Coffey, Jr. |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandun Schweizer |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony M. McCombie |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Sanalitro |