IL HB5461 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Concrete Carbon Utilization, Reduction, and Removal Breakthrough Act. Establishes a performance-based tax credit for concrete producers to incentivize the use of materials and methods for State-funded projects that reduce the embodied carbon generated in the production of concrete, and support the removal of carbon in the atmosphere and its permanent storage in concrete. Establishes a tax credit for concrete producers to defray the cost of implementing environmental product declaration technology at plants. Requires the implementation of performance-based specification standards for concrete. Directs the Department of Transportation to assess and propose opportunities to accelerate testing and evaluation of new decarbonization materials and methods for concrete by the Materials Bureau. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act to make conforming changes.
Title
CONCRETE CARBON ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-08 | House | To Revenue-Income Tax Subcommittee |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5461&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5461.htm |