IL HB5424 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-18 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Veterans' Licensure and Workforce Task Force Act. Creates the Veterans' Licensure and Workforce Task Force to advise the Governor and General Assembly and work directly with State agencies and institutions of higher education to improve and expand policies, services, programs, and opportunities for service members, veterans, and their families. Provides specified subjects for the Task Force to review and make recommendations on. Requires the Task Force to prepare and submit a report of its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor on or before December 1, 2021, and to other specified agencies in electronic form. Provides that the Act is repealed on December 1, 2022. Effective immediately.
Title
VETERANS' LICENSURE TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Grant Wehrli |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5424&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5424.htm |