IL HB5387 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Language Equity and Access Act. Creates the Division of Language Equity and Access within the Governor's Office of New Americans to lead statewide efforts in the implementation of the State's language equity and access policy for limited English proficient persons and to ensure meaningful access to information, services, programs, and activities offered by State agencies and other covered entities, including departments, offices, commissions, boards, or other agencies, for limited English proficient persons. Provides that the Division shall provide expertise and monitor implementation of the Act. Provides that the Division shall work with State agencies and covered entities and use other available State resources, such as the Office of New Americans, the Office of Equity, and the Department of Human Services Bureau of Refugee and Immigrant Services, to ensure that the State compiles available U.S. Census data on languages used across the State, including the identification of geographic patterns and trend data. Provides that each State agency and covered entity shall prepare a language access plan that will describe its limited English proficient service population, the policy and programmatic actions it will implement and the metrics that will be used to measure compliance. Provides that the Division will prepare and submit a Language Equity and Access Compliance Report to the General Assembly by January 1, 2026 and annually thereafter. Provides that the Governor's Office shall provide administrative and other support to the Governor's Office of New Americans and its Division of Language Equity and Access. Defines terms. Effective July 1, 2025.
Title
LANGUAGE EQUITY & ACCESS ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Immigration & Human Rights Committee; 007-003-000 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Immigration & Human Rights Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5387&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5387.htm |