IL HB5387 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Drug and Cosmetic Act. Sets forth the General Assembly's findings concerning the sale of energy drinks to minors. Defines "energy drink" as a beverage that contains the following ingredients or any combination of the following ingredients: (1) taurine, naturally occurring or synthesized; (2) guarana, including any extract or product of the plant or the seed of the plant; (3) glucuronolactone; and (4) any extract, herb, or tuber of any species of ginseng. Provides that it is unlawful in this State for any person to sell, offer for sale, or deliver an energy drink to a person under 18 years of age. Provides that the Director of Public Health is authorized to file a complaint and apply to the circuit court for, and such court may upon hearing and for cause shown grant, a temporary restraining order or preliminary or permanent injunction restraining any person from violating the provision concerning the Sale of energy drinks to minors.
Title
ENERGY DRINKS-SALES TO MINORS
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-13 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-11 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Luis Arroyo |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5387&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5387.htm |