IL HB5380 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Parental Digital Choice Act. Provides that the Act may be referred to as Sammy's Law. Provides that, before August 1, 2025, or within 30 days after a service becomes a large social media platform after August 1, 2025, a large social media platform provider shall create, maintain, and make available to any third-party safety software provider a set of third-party-accessible real-time application programming interfaces, including any information necessary to use the interfaces, by which a child, if the child is 13 years of age or older, or a parent or legal guardian of a child, may delegate permission to the third-party safety software provider to: (1) manage the child's online interactions, content, and account settings on the large social media platform on the same terms as the child; and (2) initiate secure transfers of user data from the large social media platform in a commonly used and machine-readable format to the third-party safety software provider. Sets forth disclosure requirements to the child and the parents or guardians of a child; requirements of third-party safety software providers; and liability of third-party safety software providers. Provides that a violation of any of the provisions of the Act is an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act to make a conforming change. Effective June 1, 2025.
Title
PARENTAL DIGITAL CHOICE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2024-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2024-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2024-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2024-03-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-25 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicole La Ha |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |