IL HB5356 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that a homeowner's insurance policy that is amended, issued, delivered, or renewed on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall provide coverage for damage caused by a sewer backup or overflow from a sump pump. Defines "homeowner's insurance policy".
Title
INS CD-HOMEOWNER'S INS-SEWER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |
2024-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 009-004-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth "Lisa" Hernandez |